Web24 jan. 2024 · Mr Jedid said he had paid Mr Soorley – who had stepped away as a registered lobbyist in 2015 after being appointed chair of state-owned CS Energy – $2500 in cash in a carpark in 2024 after he ... WebVandaag · So, in 2015, when Soorley became state-owned CS Energy’s chairman, he withdrew his lobbyist registration. That registration is legally required for lobbying, although the Integrity Act carries no penalties for …
Daily media information 🤕🤢😮 Former Logan Council CEO Sharon Kelsey ...
Non-Executive Chairman MA, BA Director since 1 October 2015 Jim Soorley was the Lord Mayor of Brisbane from 1991 to 2003, presiding over an annual budget of $1.6 billion and a workforce of 7,000. More recently, Jim has worked as a consultant for government and business across a range of issues … Meer weergeven Non-Executive Director B.ENG (Mech), MIEAust (Retired), GAICD Director since 15 December 2024. Adam Aspinall is a mechanical … Meer weergeven Non-Executive Director B.Bus (Mgt), Dip Eng (Elec), MAICD Director since 23 August 2012 Brian Green has been involved with the electricity industry for more than 40 … Meer weergeven Non-Executive Director BA PolSci Ec, GradCert AppFin, ADA1, FAIM Director since 2 October 2015 Toni Thornton has a diverse range … Meer weergeven Non-Executive Director L.L.B Director since 17 June 2024 Christina Sutherland has more than 30 years’ experience as a legal counsel having worked in private practice and as in-house counsel in commercial … Meer weergeven Web25 mei 2024 · CS Energy chairman Jim Soorley has since said all staff and contractors are now offsite and it was now under the control of Queensland police and emergency services. "There were no injuries, so we ... crow kanji persona 5
Ministerial Diary
Web16 okt. 2024 · • Speaking on Steve Austin’s ABC Brisbane Morning Show (from 1:08:00) former Lord Mayor of Brisbane, and current chair of government-owned CS Energy, Jim Soorley, confirmed that the improvement in net profit before tax from -$28.137 million in … Web11 mrt. 2024 · Former lobbyist Jim Soorley chaired state-owned corporation CS Energy when it agreed to purchase $150 million worth of power from a wind farm company that previously employed him as a consultant. Web28 mrt. 2024 · CS Energy Chairman Jim Soorley said Mr Bills had been with the business for more than four years and was integral in guiding the business through a period of unprecedented industry change. crowe tijuana